Global Patent Index - EP 1697210 A4

EP 1697210 A4 2009-02-18 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONFIGURING AIRCRAFT TO MEET PERFORMANCE GOALS AND SHOCK WAVE DISTURBANCE CONSTRAINTS

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONFIGURING AIRCRAFT TO MEET PERFORMANCE GOALS AND SHOCK WAVE DISTURBANCE CONSTRAINTS

Title (de)

SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION EINES FLUGZEUGS ZUM ERFÜLLEN VON LEISTUNGSZIELEN UND STOSSWELLENSTÖRUNGSBESCHRÄNKUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE CONFIGURATION D'UN AERONEF EN VUE D'ATTEINDRE DES OBJECTIFS DE RENDEMENT ET DE RESPECTER DES CONTRAINTES DE PERTURBATIONS DUES AUX ONDES DE CHOC

Publication

EP 1697210 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04800783 A

Priority

  • US 2004036892 W
  • US 71351503 A
  • US 71427603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005047102A2] An aircraft for low sonic boom supersonic flight conditions includes a wing with one or more areas of far-field expansion ahead of areas of far-field compression. An equivalent area distribution goal curve is scaled to account for the equivalent area reduction due to excursions below to goal curve. A relaxed constraint allows the equivalent area distribution of the aircraft to be at or below the equivalent area distribution goal curve to enable multiple parameters to be configured to meet the equivalent area distribution constraint, as well as other constraints. The shape of a reflexed portion of the airfoil on the underside of the wing, and a corresponding shape for the upper surface of the nacelle provide favorable interaction between the wing and the nacelle.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 30/00 (2006.01); B64C 1/00 (2006.01); B64D 27/18 (2006.01); B64F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64C 1/0009 (2013.01); B64C 30/00 (2013.01); B64D 27/18 (2013.01); B64F 5/00 (2013.01); B64C 2001/0045 (2013.01); Y02T 50/12 (2013.01); Y02T 50/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 0158754 A1 20010816 - LOCKHEED CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 03064254 A2 20030807 - GULFSTREAM AEROSPACE CORP [US], et al
  • [A] US 6149101 A 20001121 - TRACY RICHARD R [US]
  • [A] WO 0246038 A2 20020613 - LOCKHEED CORP [US]
  • [AD] DARDEN C M: "Sonic boom minimization with nose-bluntness relaxation", NASA TECHNICAL PAPER 1348, 1979, USA, XP002369344
  • [A] SEEBASS R ET AL: "SONIC BOOM MINIMIZATION REVISITED", AIAA PAPER, NY, 15 June 1998 (1998-06-15), pages 1 - 14, XP000827509, ISSN: 0146-3705
  • [AD] SEEBASS R ET AL: "Sonic-Boom Minimization", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AIP / ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 51, no. 2, 1 February 1972 (1972-02-01), pages 686 - 694, XP002367687, ISSN: 0001-4966
  • [A] DARDEN C M: "SONIC BOOM THEORY: ITS STATUS IN PREDICTION AND MINIMIZATION", JOURNAL OF AIRCRAFT, AIAA, RESTON, VA, US, vol. 14, no. 6, 1 June 1977 (1977-06-01), pages 569 - 576, XP001074276, ISSN: 0021-8669
  • See also references of WO 2005047102A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005047102 A2 20050526; WO 2005047102 A3 20051222; EP 1697210 A2 20060906; EP 1697210 A4 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110503

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090120

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B64C 30/00 20060101AFI20060110BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B64F 5/00 20060101ALI20090114BHEP

2007-02-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-02-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2006-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB