Global Patent Index - EP 1697950 B1

EP 1697950 B1 2009-02-11 - SWITCH FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE TOOL

Title (en)

SWITCH FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE TOOL

Title (de)

SCHALTER FüR EINE ELEKTROWERKZEUGMASCHINE

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR POUR MACHINE PORTABLE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1697950 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04820603 A

Priority

  • EP 2004052873 W
  • DE 10360249 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005062322A1] The invention relates to an electric machine tool comprising an electric power supply unit (32, 132, 232) which is removable on the tool side and provided with an at least indirectly actuatable switch (14, 114. 214) for switching on and off a driving engine. The inventive machine tool is characterised in that it is provided with an decoupling device (58, 158, 258) for decoupling the switch (14, 114. 214) and a switching unit (26, 126, 226) actuating at least indirectly said switch (14, 114. 214).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/06 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/06 (2013.01); B25F 5/02 (2013.01); H01R 13/7036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005062322 A1 20050707; CN 100530468 C 20090819; CN 1898758 A 20070117; DE 10360249 A1 20050721; DE 502004008989 D1 20090326; EP 1697950 A1 20060906; EP 1697950 B1 20090211; US 2007102268 A1 20070510; US 7767918 B2 20100803

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-09-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004008989

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111108

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008989 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB