Global Patent Index - EP 1698737 A3

EP 1698737 A3 2009-02-11 - Roof construction

Title (en)

Roof construction

Title (de)

Dachkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Construction de toiture

Publication

EP 1698737 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06100317 A

Priority

AT 1302005 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1698737A2] The roof structure has horizontal oblong and parallel guided (2) carriers (1, 1a) for adjustable admission of formed plates and roofing tile-like covering roof members (3), and perpendicular supports (4). Two neighboring carriers are provided on each side with the guide profile part. Two guide ways (21) extend over the entire length of the guide profile. In each guide way an edge of the plate intervenes. The guide profile is fastened to a base (22) of the carrier. The guide ways are turned to the guide ways at the neighboring carrier.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/16 (2006.01); E04F 10/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/166 (2013.01); E04F 10/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

AT 7687 U2 20050725; AT 7687 U3 20060615; EP 1698737 A2 20060906; EP 1698737 A3 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-11-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU