Global Patent Index - EP 1698859 A4

EP 1698859 A4 2009-02-11 - NAVIGATION DEVICE

Title (en)

NAVIGATION DEVICE

Title (de)

NAVIGATIONSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE NAVIGATION

Publication

EP 1698859 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04807254 A

Priority

  • JP 2004018896 W
  • JP 2003433833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1698859A1] A navigation device, in order to allow a user to depart for his/her destination immediately, and to provide the user with guidance information in accordance with an appropriate route to the destination, comprises an area input section (1) for the user to input a name of an area neighboring his/her destination, an arithmetic processing section (4), which searches for a route which leads the user to the area whose name is inputted in the area input section, and provides the user with guidance, in accordance with the route found by the search, so as to guide the user to the area whose name is inputted in the area input section (1). Also, the arithmetic processing section (4) specifies, after the guidance to guide the user to the area has started, a destination by exchanging a dialogue with the user. Then, the arithmetic processing section (4) selects a route which leads the user to the destination, and provides the user with guidance so as to guide the user to the destination.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01C 21/00 (2006.01); G01C 21/34 (2006.01); G01C 21/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01C 21/3608 (2013.01); G01C 21/3605 (2013.01); G08G 1/096827 (2013.01); G08G 1/096844 (2013.01); G08G 1/096894 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1698859 A1 20060906; EP 1698859 A4 20090211; CN 1898529 A 20070117; JP WO2005064275 A1 20090507; US 2007156331 A1 20070705; WO 2005064275 A1 20050714

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090415

2009-02-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 21/00 20060101AFI20050720BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 21/36 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 21/34 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2007-04-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-04-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.

2006-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB