Global Patent Index - EP 1700713 B1

EP 1700713 B1 2007-10-10 - Process for manufacturing of coatings with structured surface, applied especially for pencils, and object with structured surface

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing of coatings with structured surface, applied especially for pencils, and object with structured surface

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Beschichtungen mit strukturierter Oberfläche, verwendet insbesondere für Stifte, und Gegenstand mit strukturierter Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de revêtements avec une surface structurée, appliqué particulièrement pour des crayons, et objet avec une surface structurée

Publication

EP 1700713 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05005101 A

Priority

EP 05005101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1700713A1] The method involves application of the coating (4) on the part of the surface (3), which contains expandable particles. In the surface range of the coating, the particle to be expanded are brought, through which a raised structure develops in this surface range. The method also involves use of thermally expandable particles.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 19/14 (2006.01); B05D 5/00 (2006.01); B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B43K 19/16 (2006.01); B44C 1/00 (2006.01); B44C 1/20 (2006.01); B44C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 19/16 (2013.01); B05D 5/00 (2013.01); B05D 5/061 (2013.01); B43K 19/14 (2013.01); B43K 23/008 (2013.01); B44C 1/18 (2013.01); B05D 7/06 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24496 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24595 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249975 (2015.04); Y10T 428/25 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31989 (2015.04)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CZ DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1700713 A1 20060913; EP 1700713 B1 20071010; AT 375260 T 20071015; BR PI0600811 A 20061107; BR PI0600811 B1 20160927; CN 100490995 C 20090527; CN 1830580 A 20060913; DE 202005021097 U1 20070301; DE 502005001677 D1 20071122; MX PA06002606 A 20060908; PE 12592006 A1 20061207; US 2006204743 A1 20060914; US 7351469 B2 20080401

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-06-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502005001677

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502005001677

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-02-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502005001677

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005001677 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE FR

2007-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE FR

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050915

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU