EP 1701002 A1 20060913 - Device with a cage for a reinforced concrete tubbing
Title (en)
Device with a cage for a reinforced concrete tubbing
Title (de)
Vorrichtung mit einem Stahlbetontübbingarmierungskorb
Title (fr)
Dispositif avec une cage pour un cuvelage en béton armé
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 102005011008 A 20050310
Abstract (en)
The device has a reinforcing unit (14a) that runs over a length of a reinforced concrete tubing in a circumferential direction (16a) with respect to a bent segment form. The reinforcing unit is bent at an angle from the circumferential direction to a radial direction with respect to the segment form. A set of retainer units (26a, 28a) are designed as a single piece with the reinforcing unit. An independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a reinforced concrete tubing.
IPC 8 full level
E21D 11/08 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
E21D 11/08 (2013.01); E21D 11/086 (2016.01)
Citation (applicant)
- GB 1502207 A 19780222 - TSUZUKI J [JP]
- EP 1243753 A1 20020925 - HOCHTIEF AG HOCH TIEFBAUTEN [DE]
Citation (search report)
- [XY] GB 1502207 A 19780222 - TSUZUKI J [JP]
- [Y] JP S5330135 A 19780322 - KUBOTA LTD, et al
- [XY] EP 0160961 A2 19851113 - PHILIPP GERHARD [DE], et al
- [Y] EP 1326004 A1 20030709 - KAJIMA CORP [JP]
- [A] EP 1243753 A1 20020925 - HOCHTIEF AG HOCH TIEFBAUTEN [DE]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 04 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 10 31 August 1999 (1999-08-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 01 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 06003100 A 20060216; DE 102005011008 A 20050310