Global Patent Index - EP 1701097 A3

EP 1701097 A3 2007-10-10 - Manifold esp. for heating installations

Title (en)

Manifold esp. for heating installations

Title (de)

Rohrverteiler, insbesondere für Heizungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Distributeur, notament pour installations de chauffage

Publication

EP 1701097 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06003660 A

Priority

DE 202005003778 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1701097A2] The pipe manifold (1), especially for heating systems, has several pipe connectors (42,43) provided on the manifold housing (10), each having an encompassing groove in its outer circumference close to the end furthest from the manifold. Intermediate pieces (51-54) on the manifold side each have a pipe section with an encompassing groove in its outer circumference close to the end nearest the manifold. Each pipe connector and associated intermediate piece are tightly but releasably interconnectable by means of a grooved pipe coupling (7).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202005003778 U1 20050707; EP 1701097 A2 20060913; EP 1701097 A3 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080411

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU