EP 1702861 A1 20060920 - Packaging assembly for foodstuff
Title (en)
Packaging assembly for foodstuff
Title (de)
Verpackungsanordnung für Lebensmittel
Title (fr)
Ensemble pour le conditionnement de produit alimentaire
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 0502598 A 20050316
Abstract (en)
The assembly has a control unit controlling the flow of a residual liquid towards the exterior of a container (1`). The control unit comprises a plate mounted movable in the neighborhood of a residual liquid evacuation channel between two positions. The plate seals the evacuation channel in one position, and the plate does not seal the evacuation channel in the other position. An independent claim is also included for a method for manufacturing a food stuff packaging assembly.
IPC 8 full level
B65D 81/26 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B65D 81/261 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 5161690 A 19921110 - FOSHAUG OLAV [NO]
- [A] FR 1528159 A 19680607 - RECH S & APPLIC PLASTIQUES S A
- [A] US 6186351 B1 20010213 - COYLE FRANK [US]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 12 12 December 2002 (2002-12-12)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 06 3 June 2003 (2003-06-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 12 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1702861 A1 20060920; EP 1702861 B1 20090812; AT E439311 T1 20090815; DE 602006008368 D1 20090924; FR 2883262 A1 20060922; FR 2883262 B1 20091218
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 06290278 A 20060217; AT 06290278 T 20060217; DE 602006008368 T 20060217; FR 0502598 A 20050316