Global Patent Index - EP 1703212 A3

EP 1703212 A3 2007-10-10 - Door-lock device for a household appliance, in particular an oven

Title (en)

Door-lock device for a household appliance, in particular an oven

Title (de)

Türschlossvorrichtung für Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere Backofen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage de porte pour appareil ménager, en particulier four de cuisson

Publication

EP 1703212 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06111213 A

Priority

IT TO20050177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1703212A2] A door-lock device for an electrical household appliance, in particular an oven, comprises a body (2) to which there is hinged, via a pin (8), a catch (7) that is capable of angular movement, as well as an actuating system (3-5) having actuator means (3) that can be controlled to determine passage of the locking member (7) between a first inoperative condition, in which opening of the door (9) of the household appliance is enabled, and an operative condition, in which opening of the door (9) is prevented. Means (14) are provided for enabling translation of the pin (8), and hence of the catch (7) in order to enable manual release of the device (1) and/or compensation of any possible assembly allowances.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1703212 A2 20060920; EP 1703212 A3 20071010; EP 1703212 B1 20111005; EP 2282125 A2 20110209; EP 2282125 A3 20141119; IT TO20050177 A1 20060918

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-10-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006024817

- Effective date: 20120706

2012-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120706

2012-03-30 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-12-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006024817

- Effective date: 20111215

2011-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PL TR

2011-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-09-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GAJ, RENATO

2011-09-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORO, MARCO

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PL TR

2008-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080424

2008-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080310

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU