Global Patent Index - EP 1703990 B1

EP 1703990 B1 2009-02-25 - FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING MEMBER AND DISPENSER COMPRISING ONE SUCH MEMBER

Title (en)

FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING MEMBER AND DISPENSER COMPRISING ONE SUCH MEMBER

Title (de)

FLUIDPRODUKTABGABEGLIED UND SOLCH EIN GLIED UMFASSENDER SPENDER

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE ET DISTRIBUTEUR COMPRENANT UN TEL ORGANE

Publication

EP 1703990 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 04816572 A

Priority

  • FR 2004050719 W
  • FR 0315041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2864040A1] The unit has an actuating unit (15) coupled to an actuating shaft (13) which is moveable in the body (10) that defines an inlet pipe (11). A fixation unit (17) is provided for fixing the body in an opening (20) of a container (2) that contains a fluid product. An identification unit (3) is placed in a space defined between the body and the fixation unit and delivers information related to the spraying unit. An independent claim is also included for a fluid product sprayer comprising a spraying unit.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 15/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01); H01Q 1/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/75 (2013.01); B05B 11/0005 (2013.01); B05B 15/00 (2013.01); B65D 2203/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2864040 A1 20050624; FR 2864040 B1 20060331; BR PI0417553 A 20070327; CN 100469459 C 20090318; CN 1898028 A 20070117; DE 602004019691 D1 20090409; EP 1703990 A1 20060927; EP 1703990 B1 20090225; ES 2320460 T3 20090522; JP 2007534462 A 20071129; US 2007188329 A1 20070816; WO 2005061121 A1 20050707

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-12-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2014-11-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20141121

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALOIS SAS, LE NEUBOURG, FR

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20120502

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120502

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20120502

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2012-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004019691

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-05-22 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2320460 T3

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004019691 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05B 11/00 20060101AFI20080721BHEP

2008-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05B 15/00 20060101ALI20080721BHEP

2008-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 83/14 20060101ALI20080721BHEP

2008-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 47/34 20060101ALI20080721BHEP

2008-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01Q 1/27 20060101ALI20080721BHEP

2008-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080208

2007-03-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT