Global Patent Index - EP 1704240 B1

EP 1704240 B1 2007-10-24 - ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF OILS

Title (en)

ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF OILS

Title (de)

ENZYMATISCHE BEHANDLUNG VON ÖLEN

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT ENZYMATIQUE D'HUILES

Publication

EP 1704240 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04806534 A

Priority

  • IB 2004004374 W
  • GB 0330016 A
  • IB 2004000655 W
  • GB 0416023 A
  • US 89877504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005066351A2] The present invention relates to a method of reducing and/or removing diglyceride from an edible oil, comprising a) admixing an edible oil with an acyl acceptor substrate and a fatty-acid CoA independent diglyceride: glycerol acyltransferase, wherein the fatty-acid CoA independent diglyceride: glycerol acyltransferase is characterized as an enzyme which in an edible oil is capable of transferring an acyl group from a diglyceride to glycerol. Preferably, the diglyceride: glycerol acyltransferase comprises the amino acid sequence motif GDSX, wherein X is one or more of the following amino acid residues L, A, V, I, F, Y, H, Q, T, N, M or S. Furthermore the present invention relates to the use of a fatty-acid CoA independent diglyceride: glycerol acyltransferase characterized as an enzyme which in an edible oil is capable of transferring an acyl group from a diglyceride to glycerol, in the manufacture of an edible oil, for reducing and/or removing (preferably selectively reducing and/or removing) diglyceride from said edible oil, and to the use of said enzyme in the manufacture of a foodstuff comprising an edible oil for improving the crystallization properties of said foodstuff.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12P 7/64 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 7/6445 (2013.01); C12N 9/1029 (2013.01); C12N 9/20 (2013.01); C12P 7/6418 (2013.01); C12Y 203/01073 (2013.01); C12Y 301/01003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005066351 A2 20050721; WO 2005066351 A3 20060323; AT 376593 T 20071115; AU 2004312213 A1 20050721; AU 2004312213 B2 20100311; BR PI0418107 A 20070417; CA 2550789 A1 20050721; CA 2550789 C 20150210; CN 1898386 A 20070117; CN 1898391 A 20070117; DE 602004009713 D1 20071206; DE 602004009713 T2 20080313; DK 1704240 T3 20080225; EP 1704240 A2 20060927; EP 1704240 B1 20071024; EP 1862554 A2 20071205; EP 1862554 A3 20071219; EP 1862554 B1 20100324; ES 2294575 T3 20080401; HK 1091868 A1 20080104; JP 2007521804 A 20070809; JP 4949042 B2 20120606; NZ 547082 A 20090731

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-08-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-07-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-06-24 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150616

2012-12-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DUPONT NUTRITION BIOSCIENCES APS

- Effective date: 20121210

2012-10-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DUPONT NUTRITION BIOSCIENCES APS, DK

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DANISCO A/S, KOPENHAGEN/KOEBENHAVN, DK

- Document: DE 602004009713

- Effective date: 20120821

2012-10-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004009713

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20120821

2012-10-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004009713

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120821

2012-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004009713

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2012-08-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DUPONT NUTRITION BIOSCIENCES APS

- Effective date: 20120716

2009-09-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080425

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2009-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080125

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-08-29 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-08-29 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-07-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-05-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-05-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080224

2008-05-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-05-30 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080324

2008-05-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294575 T3

2008-02-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-01-04 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1091868

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004009713 P 20071206

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-01-26 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1091868

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRISTENSEN, ANNA CECILIE JENTOFT

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WASSELL, PAUL

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIKKELSEN, JORN DALGAARD

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOE, JORN BORCH

2006-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU