Global Patent Index - EP 1705003 B1

EP 1705003 B1 2007-10-24 - Processless lithographic printing plates

Title (en)

Processless lithographic printing plates

Title (de)

Entwicklungsfreie Flachdruckplatten

Title (fr)

Plaques d'impression lithographiques sans développement.

Publication

EP 1705003 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05102222 A

Priority

EP 05102222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1705003A1] A method of lithographic printing is disclosed which comprises the steps of (i) providing a heat-sensitive lithographic printing plate precursor comprising on a support having a hydrophilic surface or which is provided with a hydrophilic layer, a coating comprising a polymer modified with at least two groups which can form four hydrogen bonds, said groups being defined as "quadruple hydrogen bonds" or "QHB" groups; (ii) exposing said printing plate precursor to heat and/or infrared light whereby the coating switches from a hydrophilic state into a hydrophobic state or from a hydrophobic state into a hydrophilic state, thereby producing a lithographic printing master without an intermediate wet development step; (iii) supplying ink and/or fountain to said lithographic printing master by means of a lithographic printing press.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1041 (2013.01); B41M 5/368 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1705003 A1 20060927; EP 1705003 B1 20071024; DE 602005003007 D1 20071206; DE 602005003007 T2 20080814

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130321

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005003007

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130321

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120301

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005003007 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070327

2007-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU