Global Patent Index - EP 1707323 B9

EP 1707323 B9 2009-02-25 - Handle

Title (en)

Handle

Title (de)

Griff

Title (fr)

Poignée

Publication

EP 1707323 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 06006387 A

Priority

  • JP 2005103691 A
  • JP 2005114833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1707323A1] It is an object of the invention to provide an effective technique for reducing the manufacturing costs of a handle mounted to a power tool. According to the invention, a representative handle (121) may comprise a handle body (123), a grip (125), an elastic element (131) and an elastic outer surface member (133). The grip is hollow-shaped and the handle body is inserted into the grip. The elastic element is disposed between the inner surface of the grip and the outer surface of the handle body to apply a biasing force to the grip upon movement of the grip with respect to the handle body when vibration of the power tool is transmitted from the handle body to the grip. The elastic outer surface member covers the outer surface of the grip. The elastic outer surface member is integrally formed with the elastic element. As a result, the manufacturing costs can be reduced compared with known construction in which the elastic outer surface member and the elastic element are separately formed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/00 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1707323 A1 20061004; EP 1707323 B1 20080910; EP 1707323 B9 20090225; DE 602006002631 D1 20081023; DE 602006016653 D1 20101014; EP 1997592 A1 20081203; EP 1997592 B1 20100901; EP 1997592 B9 20110216; US 2006219419 A1 20061005; US 7252156 B2 20070807

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090611

2008-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006002631 P 20081023

2008-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070214

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU