EP 1707687 A3 20071107 - Suction mouth for a trench excavating machine.
Title (en)
Suction mouth for a trench excavating machine.
Title (de)
Saugmund für eine Maschine zur Herstellung von Schlitzwänden
Title (fr)
Bouche d'aspiration pour machine d'excavation de tranchée
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 0503131 A 20050331
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1707687A2] The port has an outer wall (42) defining an internal volume (57), and an upper orifice (54) connectable to a suction line. A lower suction opening (58) is symmetrical with respect to a vertical median plane of a chassis of a trench excavating machine frame parallel to the rotational axes of two rotating cutting assemblies. The opening (58) extends along the direction of the axes and is orthogonal to the flow of a drilling liquid driven by the rotation of the assemblies. A grill forming unit is fixed on the opening (58).
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
E02F 3/205 (2013.01); E02F 3/9212 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] EP 0114584 A2 19840801 - CASAGRANDE SPA [IT]
- [DY] EP 0730064 A1 19960904 - SOL COMP DU [FR]
- [YA] US 3710878 A 19730116 - ENDO M, et al
- [A] JP S5490802 A 19790718 - HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY
- [A] FR 2611770 A1 19880909 - VOLTAIR [FR]
- [A] NL 7705616 A 19781122 - POETH B V
- [A] CH 638459 A5 19830930 - HARTMANN FOERDERTECH [DE]
- [A] EP 0249555 A1 19871216 - SOLETANCHE [FR]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 350 (M - 1287) 28 July 1992 (1992-07-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 234 (M - 611) 30 July 1987 (1987-07-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 03 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK YU
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1707687 A2 20061004; EP 1707687 A3 20071107; FR 2883893 A1 20061006; FR 2883893 B1 20070622
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 06111158 A 20060315; FR 0503131 A 20050331