Global Patent Index - EP 1708146 B1

EP 1708146 B1 2007-10-24 - Token with relatively moving components and separator assembly thereof

Title (en)

Token with relatively moving components and separator assembly thereof

Title (de)

Jeton mit relativ beweglichen Komponenten und Trennanordnung dafür

Title (fr)

Jeton avec composants mobiles les uns par rapport aux autres et ensemble séparateur correspondant

Publication

EP 1708146 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 06111965 A

Priority

  • JP 2005106770 A
  • JP 2006009338 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1708146A1] A token (100) having a body member (106) with an opening therein and is configured to translate across a support surface. The token includes a sensing object (108) movable within the opening as the body member moves across the support surface. The sensing object (108) can be freely mounted for rotation, or pivotally mounted within the opening. The token can be formed of a plastic resin and metal sensing objects can be attached to the token. The sensing object mounted in the opening can further have detectable configurations such as openings and embedded metal to increase the characteristics that can be remotely sensed. A separator assembly having appropriate detectors or sensors can produce characteristic signals of the token which can be compared with pre-stored values to determine the authenticity of the token.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/06 (2006.01); G07F 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1708146 A1 20061004; EP 1708146 B1 20071024; DE 602006000178 D1 20071206; DE 602006000178 T2 20080807; JP 2006309710 A 20061109

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100330

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 4

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006000178 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ABE, HIROSHIC/O ASAHI SEIKO CO., LTD.

2007-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU