Global Patent Index - EP 1710079 B1

EP 1710079 B1 2009-02-18 - Printing machine with a temperature control device

Title (en)

Printing machine with a temperature control device

Title (de)

Druckmaschine mit Temperiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression avec dispositif de contrôle de la température

Publication

EP 1710079 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06006878 A

Priority

DE 102005015954 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1710079A1] The arrangement has temperature unit circuits (14, 20) proceeding between a temperature device (12) and a printing machine (10). An additional free cooler-temperature device (26) has a heat exchanger (36) passing through a temperature unit. The heat exchanger is brought in heat exchange with the temperature unit circuits. The heat exchanger is activated in a return of the temperature unit circuit (20).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/22 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/22 (2013.01); B41F 33/0054 (2013.01); F28C 3/06 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0077 (2013.01); F28F 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1710079 A1 20061011; EP 1710079 B1 20090218; DE 102005015954 A1 20061012; DE 102005015954 B4 20070104; EP 2018964 A1 20090128; EP 2018964 B1 20110615

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-02 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120824

2013-01-02 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20120824

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AG

- Effective date: 20091014

2009-02-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2007-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070514

2007-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070404

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU