Global Patent Index - EP 1710367 A3

EP 1710367 A3 2009-02-18 - Block of floorboards, flooring systems and methods for manufacturing and installation thereof

Title (en)

Block of floorboards, flooring systems and methods for manufacturing and installation thereof

Title (de)

Block aus Fussbodenplatten, Fussbodensysteme sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verlegung

Title (fr)

Bloc de planches de plancher, systèmes de plancher et procédés pour leur fabrication et leur installation

Publication

EP 1710367 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06115825 A

Priority

  • EP 03721225 A
  • SE 0201225 A
  • SE 0203482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03089736A1] Floorboards with a format corresponding to a traditional parquet block for laying of mechanically joined floating flooring. The invention further comprises flooring systems and methods for manufacturing and installation of floorings comprising such floorboards.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2006.01); B27M 3/04 (2006.01); E04F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2013.01); B44C 5/043 (2013.01); B44F 3/00 (2013.01); E04F 15/02033 (2013.01); E04F 21/22 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0107 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0115 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0153 (2013.01); E04F 2201/05 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0511 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0523 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03089736 A1 20031030; AT 331860 T 20060715; AU 2003224559 A1 20031103; AU 2003224559 B2 20081030; BR 0309248 A 20050209; BR 0309248 B1 20130402; CA 2483016 A1 20031030; CA 2483016 C 20100824; CN 100354492 C 20071212; CN 1646778 A 20050727; DE 20321616 U1 20080807; DE 60306509 D1 20060810; DE 60306509 T2 20061123; DE 60306509 T3 20090709; DK 1497510 T3 20060828; DK 1497510 T4 20090414; EP 1497510 A1 20050119; EP 1497510 B1 20060628; EP 1497510 B2 20081224; EP 1705309 A2 20060927; EP 1705309 A3 20090325; EP 1707705 A2 20061004; EP 1707705 A3 20090318; EP 1710367 A2 20061011; EP 1710367 A3 20090218; EP 1710368 A2 20061011; EP 1710368 A3 20090121; EP 1719854 A2 20061108; EP 1719854 A3 20090304; ES 2265571 T3 20070216; ES 2265571 T5 20090416; IL 164765 A 20090211; IL 164765 D0 20051218; JP 2005523394 A 20050804; JP 4574172 B2 20101104; KR 100990808 B1 20101029; KR 20040102146 A 20041203; NO 20044154 A 20050119; NO 336593 B1 20151005; NZ 536446 A 20070223; PL 204302 B1 20091231; PL 372392 A1 20050725; PT 1497510 E 20061130; RU 2004133902 A 20050820; RU 2007126482 A 20090120; RU 2315157 C2 20080120; RU 2436915 C2 20111220; SI 1497510 T1 20061231; SI 1497510 T2 20090630

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-10-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1497510 P

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR