Global Patent Index - EP 1710792 A3

EP 1710792 A3 2009-02-18 - Servo-balance adjusting technique for optical disk recording

Title (en)

Servo-balance adjusting technique for optical disk recording

Title (de)

Optisches Plattenaufzeichnungsverfahren mit Funktion zur Bildung von genau auf die Spur zentrierten Pits und Verfahren zur Einstellung des Servoausgleichs zur optischen Plattenaufzeichnung

Title (fr)

Technique d'enregistrement du disque optique capable de former des trous précisément centrés sur la technique d'adaptation de la piste et de la servo-balance pour l'enregistrement du disque optique

Publication

EP 1710792 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06012735 A

Priority

  • EP 99103017 A
  • JP 4875698 A
  • JP 19968898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936602A2] In recording on an optical disk, tracking control is performed using tracking error signals detected during an OFF period and a rear time segment within an ON period of a recording pulse signal. The time segment for detecting the tracking error signal within the recording pulse ON period is variably controlled in accordance with recording conditions such as a disk type and recording speed. This control can effectively prevent a tendency of pits being formed off the center line of a track toward the inner circumference of the optical disk due to the influence of residual heat from an adjoining inner track, thereby allowing pits to be formed accurately on and along the track center line. Further, during recording, a detection is made of a wobble-corresponding component contained in an HF signal corresponding to reflections of a recording light beam from the optical disk, and servo-balance adjusting variable resistors are adjusted on the basis of the detected wobble-corresponding component in such a way that the detected component presents its minimum level. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/09 (2006.01); G11B 7/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/0037 (2006.01); G11B 7/0045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/0908 (2013.01); G11B 7/0901 (2013.01); G11B 7/094 (2013.01); G11B 7/0945 (2013.01); G11B 7/0037 (2013.01); G11B 7/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0270118 A2 19880608 - FUJITSU LTD [JP]
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 550 (P - 1624) 4 October 1993 (1993-10-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936602 A2 19990818; EP 0936602 A3 20020220; EP 0936602 B1 20060920; DE 69933251 D1 20061102; DE 69933251 T2 20070516; EP 1710792 A2 20061011; EP 1710792 A3 20090218; EP 1710792 B1 20130410; US 2001010667 A1 20010802; US 6643239 B2 20031104

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160215

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160215

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69944706

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69944706

- Effective date: 20140113

2014-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140113

2013-06-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69944706

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-04-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0936602 P

2013-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2013-04-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090923

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2007-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAMAHA CORPORATION

2006-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-10-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0936602 P

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI