Global Patent Index - EP 1716941 A4

EP 1716941 A4 2007-10-17 - WATER-COOLING MOLD FOR METAL CONTINUOUS CASTING

Title (en)

WATER-COOLING MOLD FOR METAL CONTINUOUS CASTING

Title (de)

WASSERKÜHLFORM FÜR METALLSTRANGGIESSEN

Title (fr)

MOULE A REFROIDISSEMENT PAR L'EAU POUR COULEE CONTINUE D'UN METAL

Publication

EP 1716941 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04762196 A

Priority

  • CN 2004001063 W
  • CN 200410015897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1716941A1] The invention provides a water-cooled mold for continuous casting. The mold comprises two water-cooled wide copper plates which are arranged opposite to each other in front and back direction and two water-cooled narrow copper plates which are arranged opposite to each other in left and right direction. The upper portion of the cavity of the mold is a sprue area and the lower portion of the cavity is a mold cavity area. The sprue area is gradually narrowed in the casting direction and smoothly transited into the mold cavity, corresponding to the shape of a slab to be cast. The inside surfaces of the water-cooled narrow copper plates are smooth planar surface. A portion of the inside surface of the water-cooled wide copper plates in the sprue area is a curved surface and a portion of the same in the mold cavity area is a planar surface. The curved surface portion and the planar surface portion form a continuous smooth surface. Using the mold of the invention, it can be ensured to eliminate surface defects of a slab, to attain a good slab surface quality, to minimize uneven wear of a mold and to extend mold lifecycle.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 2005075131A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1716941 A1 20061102; EP 1716941 A4 20071017; EP 1716941 B1 20100428; AT 465834 T 20100515; CN 1292858 C 20070103; CN 1640581 A 20050720; DE 602004026926 D1 20100610; JP 2007517667 A 20070705; JP 5006652 B2 20120822; KR 100781317 B1 20071130; KR 20060121967 A 20061129; US 2008283213 A1 20081120; US 7891405 B2 20110222; WO 2005075131 A1 20050818

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170908

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-01-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20160918

2016-09-18 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602004026926

2011-03-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS SIEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20110128

2010-06-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004026926 P 20100610

2010-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2009-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090206

2007-10-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070913

2007-04-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2006-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT