Global Patent Index - EP 1719867 A3

EP 1719867 A3 2007-10-17 - Tubular profile element, fire protection made therefrom and method for its production

Title (en)

Tubular profile element, fire protection made therefrom and method for its production

Title (de)

Rohrförmiges Profilelement, daraus gebildeter Feuerschutzabschluss sowie Verfahren zum Herstellen desselben

Title (fr)

Élément profilé tubulaire, protéction de feu avec un tel élément et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1719867 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06006180 A

Priority

DE 102005014544 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1719867A2] The tubular profile element (8, 9) has a tubular locked interior (19, 20) and the profile element is filled by an absorbing insulating material (30, 31). A heat transfer element obstructs from a side of the profile element in the case of a fire. The insulating material (31), effective in the case of fire, has a material (30) inserted into the interior of the profile element. The material in the case of fire foams up under the heat effect to a tubular covered interior. An independent claim is included for a fire protection ending made thereof as well as method for manufacturing it.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/26303 (2013.01); E06B 5/162 (2013.01); E06B 5/164 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26321 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26394 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1719867 A2 20061108; EP 1719867 A3 20071017; DE 102005014544 A1 20061019

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU