Global Patent Index - EP 1722063 A3

EP 1722063 A3 2009-02-11 - Adjustable frame device

Title (en)

Adjustable frame device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einbau von Rahmen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le montage des châssis

Publication

EP 1722063 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06009227 A

Priority

IT BO20050330 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1722063A2] A adjustable frame device, provided with an elongated and almost rectilinear first element (2) for a mean to be fixed to a wall, comprises second threaded means (4) mutually screwed to first threaded means (3) connected to the first element (2), while the second threaded means (4) match the wall. The appropriate mutual rotation of the threaded means (3, 4) cause the spacing apart or the approaching of the first element (2) in respect to the wall.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/02 (2013.01); E06B 1/6076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1722063 A2 20061115; EP 1722063 A3 20090211; IT BO20050330 A1 20061107

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100114

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU