Global Patent Index - EP 1722099 B1

EP 1722099 B1 2009-02-18 - Fastening device

Title (en)

Fastening device

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation

Publication

EP 1722099 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06117773 A

Priority

  • EP 02719641 A
  • DE 10109408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02068815A1] The invention relates to a fastening device for fastening a fuel injection valve (1) in a cylinder head (2) of an internal combustion engine. Said fastening device comprises at least one hold-down element (11), which is fastened to a face (12) of the cylinder head (3) and which fixes the fuel injection valve (1) in an accommodating boring (9) of the cylinder head (2). The at least one hold-down element (11) is supported on a shoulder (7), which is provided on a discharge-side end (6) of the fuel injection valve (1), and which at least partially encircles the fuel injection valve (1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/465 (2013.01); F02M 61/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 0036295 A1 20000622 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 02068815 A1 20020906; CN 1457393 A 20031119; CZ 20023489 A3 20040512; DE 10109408 A1 20020905; DE 50208596 D1 20061214; DE 50213305 D1 20090402; EP 1366285 A1 20031203; EP 1366285 B1 20061102; EP 1722099 A2 20061115; EP 1722099 A3 20061129; EP 1722099 B1 20090218; JP 2004518863 A 20040624; US 2003154961 A1 20030821; US 6772736 B2 20040810

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120227

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213305

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120227

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120227

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110301

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213305 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1366285 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070529

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-11-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1366285 P

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT