Global Patent Index - EP 1727970 B1

EP 1727970 B1 2007-10-31 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTABLISHING THE STATE OF THE ROTOR OF A TURBOMACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTABLISHING THE STATE OF THE ROTOR OF A TURBOMACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERKENNEN DES ZUSTANDS DES ROTORS EINER STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

METHODE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ETABLIR L'ETAT D'UN ROTOR DE TURBOMACHINE

Publication

EP 1727970 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05715936 A

Priority

  • EP 2005002560 W
  • EP 04006256 A
  • EP 05715936 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1577492A1] The rotor of a turbo machine in the exposed state has a control section (29) visible from the outside, and a monitoring section which is not visible from the outside. A weakened point in the fashion of a design break point is provided in the control section. When the machine is running, possible emerging damage of the rotor is recognized through a non-critical defect (39) emerging in the region of the weakened point (31) and propagating from this point. The weakened point is formed by a material weakening in the form of a notch (32). Independent claims are also included for the following: (A) a turbo machine equipped with the aforesaid rotor; and (B) a method for the recognizing of the state of the exposed rotor of a turbo machine.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/02 (2006.01); F01D 5/00 (2006.01); F01D 21/00 (2006.01); F01D 21/04 (2006.01); F01D 21/06 (2006.01); G01N 3/02 (2006.01); G01N 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 21/045 (2013.01); F01D 21/00 (2013.01); F01D 21/06 (2013.01); F05D 2260/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1577492 A1 20050921; CN 1985069 A 20070620; DE 502005001830 D1 20071213; EP 1727970 A1 20061206; EP 1727970 B1 20071031; ES 2293543 T3 20080316; JP 2007529669 A 20071025; JP 4447637 B2 20100407; RU 2006136383 A 20080427; RU 2377415 C2 20091227; US 2008145223 A1 20080619; US 7568886 B2 20090804; WO 2005093220 A1 20051006

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170310

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170310

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170310

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005001830

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-12 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 502005001830

2011-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005001830

2011-10-01 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 502005001830

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2293543 T3

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005001830 P 20071213

2007-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071121

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-06-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2006-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI