Global Patent Index - EP 1729317 B1

EP 1729317 B1 2007-10-24 - Helically wound fusible conductor for fuse element with plastic sealing

Title (en)

Helically wound fusible conductor for fuse element with plastic sealing

Title (de)

Wickelschmelzleiter für ein Schmelzsicherungsbauelement mit Kunststoffversiegelung

Title (fr)

Conducteur fusible pour coupe-circuit enroulée en hélice avec fermeture en plastique

Publication

EP 1729317 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05011930 A

Priority

EP 05011930 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1729317A1] Fuse wire has a fuse wire strand (2) wound over an electrically insulating or high-impedance core (3). A temperature stable plastic (4) is applied on the core in such a manner that the surface area of the core freely lying between the fuse wire strand is covered by the plastic. The spaces formed between the wound fuse wire strand and the surface of the core is also filled with the plastic. An independent claim is also included for the production of a coiled fuse wire.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/18 (2006.01); H01H 85/042 (2006.01); H01H 85/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/42 (2013.01); H01H 85/042 (2013.01); H01H 85/185 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

GB 227928 A 19250126 - REYROLLE A & CO LTD, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1729317 A1 20061206; EP 1729317 B1 20071024; CN 1873875 A 20061206; DE 502005001781 D1 20071206; JP 2006339161 A 20061214; JP 4733570 B2 20110727; US 2007132539 A1 20070614

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005001781 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2007-08-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2006-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060602

2006-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU