Global Patent Index - EP 1731234 A4

EP 1731234 A4 2007-10-24 - TUBE MANUFACTURING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FIXED DIAMETER ROLLING

Title (en)

TUBE MANUFACTURING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FIXED DIAMETER ROLLING

Title (de)

ROHRHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUM FESTDURCHMESSERWALZEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TUBES ET DISPOSITIF POUR LAMINAGE À DIAMÈTRE FIXE

Publication

EP 1731234 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05721298 A

Priority

  • JP 2005005198 W
  • JP 2004096821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1731234A1] The present invention provides a method of manufacturing a pipe or tube, comprising the step of rolling the pipe or tube by using a sizing mill comprising a plurality of stands each of which has a plurality of grooved rolls, wherein the grooved rolls are so configured that when tangents are drawn at edge parts facing to each other of adjacent grooved rolls at each stand, assuming that a minimum value of angles defined by the tangents in all stands is ² (deg), an outer diameter of the pipe or tube at an output side of the sizing mill is D (mm), and a thickness of the pipe or tube at the output side of the sizing mill is t (mm), the angle ² satisfies a following formula (1): ² ‰¥ 1.13 × 10 × Ln t / D × 100 + 1.37 × 10 2

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/14 (2006.01); B21B 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/14 (2013.01); B21B 27/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1731234 A1 20061213; EP 1731234 A4 20071024; EP 1731234 B1 20110803; CN 100409953 C 20080813; CN 1905958 A 20070131; JP 4650747 B2 20110316; JP WO2005092531 A1 20080207; WO 2005092531 A1 20051006

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 602005029304

- Effective date: 20110808

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 602005029304

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005029304

- Representative's name: RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE LORENZ SEIDLER GOSS, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005029304

- Representative's name: LORENZ SEIDLER GOSSEL RECHTSANWAELTE PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005029304

- Representative's name: RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE LORENZ SEIDLER GOSS, DE

2013-12-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20131108

2012-08-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005029304

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120504

2011-09-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005029304

- Effective date: 20110929

2011-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2011-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: INAGE, TAKATERU

2011-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OKUI, TATSUYA

2011-02-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TUBE MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR FIXED DIAMETER ROLLING

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090324

2007-10-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-07-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-07-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060419

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT