Global Patent Index - EP 1731626 A4

EP 1731626 A4 2007-10-31 - HIGH-RIGIDITY HIGH-STRENGTH THIN STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

HIGH-RIGIDITY HIGH-STRENGTH THIN STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

HOCHSTEIFES HOCHFESTES DÜNNES STAHLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

FEUILLE MINCE D"ACIER HAUTE RIGIDITE HAUTE RESISTANCE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LADITE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 1731626 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05727349 A

Priority

  • JP 2005006288 W
  • JP 2004106721 A
  • JP 2004347025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1731626A1] There is provided a high-stiffness high-strength thin steel sheet having a tensile strength of not less than 590 MPa and a Young's modulus of not less than 225 GPa, which comprises C: 0.02-0.15%, Si: not more than 1.5%, Mn: 1.5-4.0%, P: not more than 0.05%, S: not more than 0.01%, Al: not more than 1.5%, N: not more than 0.01% and Nb: 0.02-0.40% as mass%, provided that C, N and Nb contents satisfy 0.01 ‰¤C+(12/14)×N-(12/92.9)×Nb ‰¤ 0.06 and N ‰¤ (14/92.9)×(Nb-0.01) and the remainder being substantially iron and inevitable impurities, and has a texture comprising a ferrite phase as a main phase and having a martensite phase at an area ratio of not less than 1%.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/48 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0205 (2013.01); C21D 9/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1731626 A1 20061213; EP 1731626 A4 20071031; EP 1731626 B1 20170719; AU 2005227556 A1 20051013; AU 2005227556 B2 20080214; CA 2546003 A1 20051013; KR 100881048 B1 20090130; KR 20060134030 A 20061227; TW 200604347 A 20060201; TW I307721 B 20090321; US 2008118390 A1 20080522; WO 2005095663 A1 20051013

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005052363

2017-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2017-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-07-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170609

2017-06-14 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2017-02-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170124

2011-10-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110927

2007-10-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-07-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-07-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060602

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB