Global Patent Index - EP 1731627 A4

EP 1731627 A4 2007-10-31 - HIGH-RIGIDITY HIGH-STRENGTH THIN STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

HIGH-RIGIDITY HIGH-STRENGTH THIN STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

HOCHSTEIFES HOCHFESTES DÜNNES STAHLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

MINCE FEUILLE D'ACIER DE RIGIDITE ET DE RESISTANE ELECVEE ET PROCEDE POUR SA PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1731627 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05728004 A

Priority

  • JP 2005006327 W
  • JP 2004107040 A
  • JP 2004346620 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1731627A1] There is provided a high-stiffness high-strength thin steel sheet having a tensile strength of not less than 590 MPa and a Young's modulus of not less than 230 GPa, which comprises C: 0.02-0.15%, Si: not more than 1.5%, Mn: 1.0-3.5%, P: not more than 0.05%, S: not more than 0.01%, Al: not more than 1.5%, N: not more than 0.01% and Ti: 0.02-0.50% as mass%, provided that C, N, S and Ti contents satisfy Ti* = Ti-(47.9/14)×N-(47.9/32.1)×S ‰¥ 0.01 and 0.01 ‰¤ C-(12/47.9)×Ti* ‰¤ 0.05 and the remainder being substantially iron and inevitable impurities, and has a texture comprising a ferrite phase as a main phase and having a martensite phase at an area ratio of not less than 1%.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C21D 9/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/14 (2013.01); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1731627 A1 20061213; EP 1731627 A4 20071031; EP 1731627 B1 20130821; AU 2005227564 A1 20051013; AU 2005227564 B2 20080221; CA 2546009 A1 20051013; KR 100881047 B1 20090205; KR 20060134029 A 20061227; TW 200604352 A 20060201; TW I312810 B 20090801; US 2007144633 A1 20070628; WO 2005095664 A1 20051013

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-09-04 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005040954

- Effective date: 20140522

2014-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140522

2013-10-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005040954

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-10-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110927

2007-10-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-07-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-07-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060602

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB