Global Patent Index - EP 1732088 A3

EP 1732088 A3 2007-10-31 - Electromagnetic actuator

Title (en)

Electromagnetic actuator

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Stellantrieb

Title (fr)

Actionneur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1732088 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06113990 A

Priority

  • DE 102005026535 A
  • DE 102005029018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1732088A2] A separate electromagnetic coil (12) is assigned to each pole (7). A holding device (11) applies electric current to the coils and secures an armature (2) in its end positions so that the pole faces (8,9) of neighboring poles are oppositely polarized.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/14 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 7/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1732088 A2 20061213; EP 1732088 A3 20071031; EP 1732088 B1 20130814; US 2006279389 A1 20061214; US 7623012 B2 20091124

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-27 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 502006013108

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-08-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006013108

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140515

2013-10-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006013108

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-04-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130405

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080125

2008-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071128

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 7/14 20060101AFI20060911BHEP

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 7/08 20060101ALI20070927BHEP

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01L 9/04 20060101ALI20070927BHEP

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU