EP 1732580 A4 20080123 - EPHA2 VACCINES
Title (en)
EPHA2 VACCINES
Title (de)
EPHA2-IMPFSTOFFE
Title (fr)
VACCINS EPHA2
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2004034693 W 20041015
- US 53269603 P 20031224
- US 60258804 P 20040818
- US 61554804 P 20041001
- US 61756404 P 20041007
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2005067460A2] The present invention relates to methods and compositions designed for the treatment, management, or prevention of cancer, particularly metastatic cancer, and hyperproliferative diseases involving EphA2-expressing cells. In one embodiment, the methods of the invention comprise the administration of an effective amount of an EphA2 antigenic peptide to elicit an immune response against the EphA2-expressing cells. In other embodiments, the methods of the invention entail the use of an EphA2 expression vehicle, such as a naked nucleic acid or viral vector. In yet other embodiments, the methods of the invention comprise the use of adoptive immunotherapy with autologous or non-autologous antigen presenting cells that are sensitized with one or more EphA2 antigenic peptides. The invention also provides pharmaceutical compositions comprising one or more EphA2 antigenic peptides, expression vehicles or antigen-presenting cells of the invention either alone or in combination with one or more other agents useful for cancer therapy.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A01N 37/18 (2006.01); A01N 43/04 (2006.01); A01N 63/00 (2006.01); A01N 65/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61K 39/001122 (2018.08 - EP US); A61K 47/6425 (2017.08 - EP); A61K 47/644 (2017.08 - EP); A61K 47/6901 (2017.08 - EP); A61K 2035/122 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 2039/52 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 2039/523 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 2039/5256 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 2039/53 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 2039/6043 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 2039/6056 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 03094859 A2 20031120 - MEDIMMUNE INC [US], et al
- [A] KINCH MICHAEL S ET AL: "Overexpression and functional alterations of the EphA2 tyrosine kinase in cancer.", CLINICAL & EXPERIMENTAL METASTASIS 2003, vol. 20, no. 1, February 2003 (2003-02-01), pages 59 - 68, XP002337168, ISSN: 0262-0898
- [A] COFFMAN KAREN T ET AL: "Differential EphA2 epitope display on normal versus malignant cells.", CANCER RESEARCH 15 NOV 2003, vol. 63, no. 22, 15 November 2003 (2003-11-15), pages 7907 - 7912, XP002993150, ISSN: 0008-5472
- [A] CARLES-KINCH KELLY ET AL: "Antibody targeting of the EphA2 tyrosine kinase inhibits malignant cell behavior.", CANCER RESEARCH 15 MAY 2002, vol. 62, no. 10, 15 May 2002 (2002-05-15), pages 2840 - 2847, XP002309753, ISSN: 0008-5472
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2005067460 A2 20050728; WO 2005067460 A3 20061026; EP 1732580 A2 20061220; EP 1732580 A4 20080123
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2004034693 W 20041015; EP 04809990 A 20041015