EP 1734313 A1 20061220 - Air conditioner and control method of the same
Title (en)
Air conditioner and control method of the same
Title (de)
Klimaanlage und Steuerungsverfahren dafür
Title (fr)
Dispositif de climatisation et son procédé de commande
Publication
Application
Priority
KR 20050051415 A 20050615
Abstract (en)
Disclosed are an air conditioner and a control method of the same. An air intake opening is formed on the front surface of a main body (10), air discharge openings (4,6) are formed on the upper and lower portions thereof, respectively, a plurality of blower fans (30,40) are vertically installed inside the main body (10), and a control unit (68) controls the plurality of blower fans according to a cooling/heating operation, thus a discharge direction of cool air/warm air can be vertically adjusted according to the cooling/heating operation, thereby making the room air-conditioned more efficiently during the cooling/heating operation.
IPC 8 full level
F24F 1/00 (2006.01); F24F 1/0323 (2019.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
F24F 1/0014 (2013.01 - EP KR); F24F 1/0033 (2013.01 - EP KR); F24F 1/0057 (2019.01 - EP); F24F 1/0323 (2019.01 - EP KR US); F24F 11/79 (2017.12 - KR); F24F 1/0057 (2019.01 - KR); F24F 2221/54 (2013.01 - EP KR)
Citation (search report)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 071 (M - 567) 4 March 1987 (1987-03-04)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 289 (M - 845) 5 July 1989 (1989-07-05)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 071 (M - 567) 4 March 1987 (1987-03-04)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 143 (M - 035) 8 October 1980 (1980-10-08)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 154 (M - 038) 28 October 1980 (1980-10-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR IT
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK YU
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1734313 A1 20061220; AU 2006202532 A1 20070111; KR 100755321 B1 20070905; KR 20060131174 A 20061220
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 06012307 A 20060614; AU 2006202532 A 20060614; KR 20050051415 A 20050615