Global Patent Index - EP 1737608 B8

EP 1737608 B8 2009-02-18 - METHOD FOR PULSE WELDING A SHEET METAL PART SUCH AS A PIPE TO A CAST METAL PART SUCH AS A HOUSING PORT FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PULSE WELDING A SHEET METAL PART SUCH AS A PIPE TO A CAST METAL PART SUCH AS A HOUSING PORT FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM PULS-SCHWEISSEN EINES BLECHBAUTEILS WIE EIN ROHR MIT EINEM GUSSMETALLBAUTEIL WIE EINE ÖFFNUNG EINES GEHÄUSES FÜR ABGASANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE PAR IMPULSIONS D'UN ELEMENT EN TOLE TEL QU'UN TUBE AVEC UN ELEMENT EN METAL COULE TEL QU'UNE OUVERTURE DE BOITIER POUR UN SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 1737608 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 05715467 A

Priority

  • EP 2005001873 W
  • DE 102004009109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005080045A1] Disclosed is a method for joining a sheet metal part (3) to a cast metal part (5). According to the inventive method, the sheet metal part (3) and the other part (5) are welded together in a pulsed welding process. Said method particularly allows a sheet metal pipe (3) to be welded to the port (12) of a cast metal housing (13). Said advantage can be used for an exhaust system comprising an exhaust manifold (3) and an exhaust unit such as a turbocharger (5).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/32 (2006.01); B23K 9/028 (2006.01); B23K 9/23 (2006.01); B23K 26/00 (2006.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01); F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/32 (2013.01); B23K 9/0282 (2013.01); B23K 9/232 (2013.01); B23K 26/323 (2013.01); F01N 13/102 (2013.01); F01N 13/1805 (2013.01); F02B 67/10 (2013.01); B23K 2101/006 (2018.08); B23K 2101/04 (2018.08); B23K 2103/06 (2018.08); B23K 2103/18 (2018.08); B23K 2103/50 (2018.08); F01N 2450/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005080045 A1 20050901; DE 102004009109 A1 20050915; DE 502005005890 D1 20081218; EP 1737608 A1 20070103; EP 1737608 B1 20081105; EP 1737608 B8 20090218; JP 2007534495 A 20071129; US 2007289954 A1 20071220; US 8183494 B2 20120522

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-09 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2013-01-10 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 502005005890

- Effective date: 20130110

2012-11-21 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-11-21 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-07-24 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502005005890

2012-07-24 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 502005005890

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120203

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2009-11-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FRIEDRICH BOYSEN GMBH & CO. KG

2009-09-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRIEDRICH BOYSEN GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-02-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005005890 P 20081218

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BORGWARNER INC.

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2008-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2008-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORGWARNER TURBO SYSTEMS GMBH

2008-06-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PULSE WELDING A SHEET METAL PART SUCH AS A PIPE TO A CAST METAL PART SUCH AS A HOUSING PORT FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORGWARNER TURBO SYSTEMS GMBH

2007-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2007-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORGWARNER TURBO SYSTEMS GMBH

2007-05-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-05-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORGWARNER TURBO SYSTEMS GMBH

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070312

2007-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060826

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE