EP 1743720 A1 20070117 - Process for the manufacture of rotationally symmetrical workpieces, with or without toothed profile
Title (en)
Process for the manufacture of rotationally symmetrical workpieces, with or without toothed profile
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Herstellung rotationssymmetrischer Werkstücke mit oder ohne Verzahnungsprofil
Title (fr)
Procédé pour la fabrication de pièces à symétrie de révolution, avec ou sans profil de dent
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 05015102 A 20050712
Abstract (en)
The production process involves deforming the initial material (3) using a shaping die (1) and a rotatable tool (2). The die has a boring (11) along its central axis. The initial material is passed into the boring and pressed between the die and the rotating tool, so that it flows outwards from the center into the contour of the die.
IPC 8 full level
B21J 9/02 (2006.01); B21J 5/02 (2006.01); B21J 5/08 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
B21J 5/02 (2013.01 - EP KR US); B21J 5/063 (2013.01 - EP US); B21J 5/08 (2013.01 - EP US); B21J 9/025 (2013.01 - EP KR US); B21K 1/30 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] GB 1457600 A 19761208 - ROWEN ARC LTD, et al
- [A] DE 19714753 A1 19981015 - GFU GES FUER UMFORMUNG UND MAS [DE]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 257 (M - 513) 3 September 1986 (1986-09-03)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 12 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 09 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK YU
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1743720 A1 20070117; BR PI0520427 A2 20090512; CA 2614743 A1 20070118; CN 101247906 A 20080820; JP 2009501084 A 20090115; KR 20080030654 A 20080404; MX 2008000494 A 20080307; US 2010077826 A1 20100401; WO 2007006340 A1 20070118
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05015102 A 20050712; BR PI0520427 A 20051109; CA 2614743 A 20051109; CN 200580051048 A 20051109; EP 2005011984 W 20051109; JP 2008520722 A 20051109; KR 20087003072 A 20080205; MX 2008000494 A 20051109; US 99525505 A 20051109