Global Patent Index - EP 1744813 A4

EP 1744813 A4 2009-02-25 - ULTRASONIC PROBE CAPABLE OF BENDING WITH AID OF A BALLOON

Title (en)

ULTRASONIC PROBE CAPABLE OF BENDING WITH AID OF A BALLOON

Title (de)

MITHILFE EINES BALLONS BIEGBARE ULTRASCHALLSONDE

Title (fr)

SONDE ECHOGRAPHIQUE POUVANT SE PLIER A L'AIDE D'UN BALLONNET

Publication

EP 1744813 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04752362 A

Priority

US 2004015332 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005115545A1] An ultrasonic medical device (11) includes a balloon catheter (36) having at least one engaging mechanism (66, 67), a balloon (41) that is supported by the balloon catheter (36), an inflation lumen (85) located along a longitudinal axis of the balloon catheter (36) and an ultrasonic probe (15) located along an outside surface of the balloon catheter (36) wherein the ultrasonic probe (15) engages an outer surface (53) of the balloon (41).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 7/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/22012 (2013.01); A61B 2017/22014 (2013.01); A61B 2017/22061 (2013.01); A61B 2017/22071 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005115545 A1 20051208; EP 1744813 A1 20070124; EP 1744813 A4 20090225; JP 2007536986 A 20071220

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-09 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090128

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARE, BRADLEY, A.

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RABINER, ROBERT, A.

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARCIANTE, REBECCA, I.

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VARADY, MARK, J.

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RABINER, DANIEL, E.

2007-08-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARE, BRADLEY, A.

2007-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RABINER, ROBERT, A.

2007-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARCIANTE, REBECCA, I.

2007-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VARADY, MARK, J.

2007-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RABINER, DANIEL, E.

2007-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR