Global Patent Index - EP 1745094 A4

EP 1745094 A4 2009-02-25 - HOT-MELT ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON OLEFIN CO-POLYMERS

Title (en)

HOT-MELT ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON OLEFIN CO-POLYMERS

Title (de)

SCHMELZKLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON OLEFINCOPOLYMEREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS D'ADHESIF THERMOFUSIBLE A BASE DE COPOLYMERES OLEFINIQUES

Publication

EP 1745094 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05747477 A

Priority

  • US 2005016250 W
  • US 57004804 P
  • US 57430604 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005111132A1] The present invention relates to a new type of polyolefin based hot-melt adhesive and methods for their production. More particularly, it relates to a new type of hot-melt adhesive comprising propylene co-polymers and possessing a favorable balance of cohesive strength, adhesion properties, and processibility, which render them especially well-suited for some hot-melt adhesive applications, for example, as elastic attachment adhesives.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/01 (2006.01); C08F 10/14 (2006.01); C08F 210/06 (2006.01); C08K 3/26 (2006.01); C08K 5/134 (2006.01); C08K 5/524 (2006.01); C08L 23/00 (2006.01); C09J 123/10 (2006.01); C08F 210/08 (2006.01); C08L 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 210/06 (2013.01); C08F 10/06 (2013.01); C08K 5/1345 (2013.01); C08K 5/524 (2013.01); C09J 123/10 (2013.01); C08F 210/08 (2013.01); C08K 5/005 (2013.01); C08L 51/06 (2013.01); C08L 2666/24 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 210/06 + C08F 4/6555
  2. C08K 5/1345 + C08L 23/10
  3. C08K 5/524 + C08L 23/10
  4. C08F 210/06 + C08F 210/08 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/20
  5. C08F 210/08 + C08F 210/06 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/20
  6. C08F 10/06 + C08F 4/6555

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005111132 A1 20051124; WO 2005111132 A8 20070524; EP 1745094 A1 20070124; EP 1745094 A4 20090225; KR 20070057085 A 20070604; MX PA06012993 A 20080311

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110317

2010-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100906

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090127

2007-08-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUN, LIXIN

2007-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUENACOSA, ENRICO, L.

2007-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HASELMAN, JIM

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUN, LIXIN

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUENACOSA, ENRICO, L.

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HASELMAN, JIM

2007-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061110

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR