Global Patent Index - EP 1746235 A3

EP 1746235 A3 2009-02-11 - Fitting assembly

Title (en)

Fitting assembly

Title (de)

Beschlaganordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de ferrure

Publication

EP 1746235 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06009553 A

Priority

DE 202005009745 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1746235A2] A window frame is attached by a hinge to a surrounding outer frame fixed to the building structure. The window range of swing-action is limited by a gear-operated pushrod slide fitting with a lockbar and lockbar attachment fitting. A gear wheel (24) is located between gear pushrod (7) and pushrod connector (9).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202005009745 U1 20061102; AT 458115 T 20100315; DE 502006006150 D1 20100401; EP 1746235 A2 20070124; EP 1746235 A3 20090211; EP 1746235 B1 20100217; EP 1746235 B8 20100414

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110509

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 458115 T

- Effective date: 20110509

2012-05-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120412 AND 20120418

2012-03-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MACO TECHNOLOGIE GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MACO VERMOEGENSVERWALTUNG GMBH, SALZBURG, AT

- Document: DE 502006006150

- Effective date: 20120126

2012-03-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006006150

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120126

2012-03-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006006150

- Representative's name: MANITZ FINSTERWALD PATENTANWAELTE PARTMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120126

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100217

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101118

2010-08-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100217

2010-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006006150 P 20100401

2010-03-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MACO VERMOEGENSVERWALTUNG GMBH

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PL

2010-02-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PL

2009-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU