Global Patent Index - EP 1747201 B8

EP 1747201 B8 2009-02-18 - 2H OR 3H-BENZO[E]INDAZOL-1-YLE CARBAMATE DERIVATIVES, THE PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF

Title (en)

2H OR 3H-BENZO[E]INDAZOL-1-YLE CARBAMATE DERIVATIVES, THE PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF

Title (de)

2H- ODER 3H-BENZO[E]INDAZOL-1-YL-KARBAMAT-DERIVATE, HERSTELLUNG UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE CARBAMATE DE 2H- OU 3H-BENZO[E]INDAZOL-1-YLE, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION EN THERAPEUTIQUE

Publication

EP 1747201 B8 (FR)

Application

EP 05770962 A

Priority

  • FR 2005001154 W
  • FR 0405055 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005121099A1] The invention relates to compounds of formula (I), wherein W is an oxygen or sulphur atom, each X, X2, X3 and X4 independently represents a hydrogen or halogen atom or a cyano, C,-C6-alkyl, C,-C6-fluoralkyl, C,-C6-alkoxy, C,-C6-fluoroalkoxy group, Y is in position (N2) or (N3); when Y is in the (N2) position, Y represents a C,-C6-alkyl, C,-C6-fluoralkyl, aryl or heteroaryl group; when Y is in the (N3) position, Y represents an aryl or heteroaryl group; the aryl and heteroaryl groups are possibly substituted by one or several atoms or groups selected from halogen atoms, C,-C6-alkyl, C,-C6-alkoxy, C,-C6-alkylthio, C,-C6-alkyl-S(O)-, C,-C6-alkyl-S(0)2-, C,-C6-fluoralkyl groups; a C4-C5 position bond is double or single; each R1 et R2 independently represents an aryl, benzyl or C,-C6-alkyl group or R1 et R2 form, with a nitrogen atom carrier thereof, a heterocycle possibly substituted by one or several C1-C6-alkyl or benzyl groups in the form of a base, an acid addition salt, a hydrate or a solvate. A method for preparation and therapeutic use is also disclosed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/54 (2006.01); A61K 31/416 (2006.01); C07D 231/56 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/56 (2013.01); C07D 231/54 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

FR 2870239 A1 20051118; FR 2870239 B1 20060616; AR 049090 A1 20060628; AT 411295 T 20081015; AU 2005251982 A1 20051222; AU 2005251982 B2 20110428; BR PI0508563 A 20070814; CA 2557942 A1 20051222; CA 2557942 C 20130806; CN 100577648 C 20100106; CN 1930131 A 20070314; CR 8570 A 20071004; CY 1108710 T1 20140409; DE 602005010418 D1 20081127; DK 1747201 T3 20090216; EC SP066810 A 20061116; EP 1747201 A1 20070131; EP 1747201 B1 20081015; EP 1747201 B8 20090218; ES 2315898 T3 20090401; HK 1104288 A1 20100917; HR P20090012 T3 20090228; IL 177632 A 20120731; IL 177632 D0 20061231; JP 2007537212 A 20071220; JP 4909889 B2 20120404; KR 101165483 B1 20120713; KR 20070007796 A 20070116; MA 28372 A1 20061201; NO 20064073 A 20061106; NZ 549330 A 20100827; PT 1747201 E 20090119; RS 50724 B 20100831; RU 2006132325 A 20080320; RU 2379293 C2 20100120; SI 1747201 T1 20090430; TN SN06258 A1 20071203; TW 200604181 A 20060201; TW I349004 B 20110921; US 2007105932 A1 20070510; US 2009143380 A1 20090604; US 2012108584 A1 20120503; US 7501449 B2 20090310; US 8114899 B2 20120214; US 8258168 B2 20120904; WO 2005121099 A1 20051222; ZA 200607244 B 20080430

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150511

2016-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160628

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 411295 T

- Effective date: 20150510

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005010418

2015-08-31 [REG PL LAPE] DECISIONS ON THE LAPSE OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN THE TERRITORY OF THE REPUBLIC OF POLAND

2015-08-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-02-27 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20150106

2015-02-27 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140511

2015-02-27 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140511

2015-02-27 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-02-27 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-03 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 4880

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090400051

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-01-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-01-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-01-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140511

2015-01-15 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E002710

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-05 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140531

2014-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2014-12-29 [REG LT MM4D] LAPSE EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20140510

2014-11-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140510

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20130502

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20130411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20130410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-30 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP IS] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Payment date: 20130409

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-04-30 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-04-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANOFI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANOFI-AVENTIS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 602005010418

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANOFI-AVENTIS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 602005010418

- Effective date: 20130205

2009-09-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090716

2009-05-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E004888

2009-04-30 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2315898 T3

2009-02-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090400051

2009-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-01-19 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-01-14 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2008-12-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: AL

2008-12-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: BA

2008-12-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: HR

2008-12-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: LV

2008-12-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: MK

2008-12-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: YU

2008-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005010418 P 20081127

2008-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LV MK

2008-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-15 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: AL

2007-08-15 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: HR

2007-08-15 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: LV

2007-08-15 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20061211

- Countries: MK

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUBOIS, LAURENT

2007-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EVANNO, YANNICK

2007-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MALOIZEL, CHRISTIAN

2007-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEVRIN, MIREILLE

2007-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2007-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LV MK