Global Patent Index - EP 1752355 A3

EP 1752355 A3 2007-10-03 - Train control system

Title (en)

Train control system

Title (de)

Zugsicherungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de commande de trains

Publication

EP 1752355 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06117245 A

Priority

GB 0516670 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1752355A2] A train control system comprises an interlocking for producing signalling information, processing equipment for communication with a train for relaying safety information therebetween and an interface between the interlocking and the processing equipment, wherein the interface is bi-directional to enable signals to be passed between the processing equipment and the interlocking in both directions, and the processing equipment passes indications between the processing equipment and the interlocking that modify interlocking functions and / or enable delegation of specific interlocking functions to the processing equipment.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 27/00 (2006.01); B61L 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 21/04 (2013.01); B61L 27/0038 (2013.01); B61L 2027/0044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0254492 A2 19880127 - WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL [GB]
  • [A] GB 2198271 A 19880608 - BRITISH RAILWAYS BOARD
  • [X] MILIUS B: "STELLWERKE VON MORGEN WELCHE ROLLE KANN DAS STELLWERK IN EINEM ETCS-LEVEL-3-SYSTEM NOCH SPIELEN? INTERLOCKINGS FOR TOMORROW HOW TO INTEGRATE INTERLOCKINGS IN ETCS LEVEL 3 SYSTEMS", ZEVRAIL - GLASERS ANNALEN, GEORG SIEMENS VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, vol. 126, no. 2/3, 2002, pages 106 - 114, XP001145097, ISSN: 1618-8330
  • [PA] RENZ H-W ET AL: "KOPPLUNG STELLWERK/ZUGSICHERUNG MIT NEUER HOCHVERFUEGBARER SCHNITTSTELLE INTERCONNECTION BETWEEN ELECTRONIC INTERLOCKING AND AUTOMATIC TRAIN CONTROL VIA NEW HIGHLY AVAILABLE INTERFACE", SIGNAL + DRAHT, TETZLAFF, HAMBURG, DE, December 2005 (2005-12-01), pages 35 - 39, XP001236365, ISSN: 0037-4997

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1752355 A2 20070214; EP 1752355 A3 20071003; EP 1752355 B1 20091202; EP 1752355 B2 20140507; AT 450427 T 20091215; DE 602006010772 D1 20100114; DK 1752355 T3 20100201; DK 1752355 T4 20140811; ES 2337388 T3 20100423; ES 2337388 T5 20140902; GB 0516670 D0 20050921; GB 2429101 A 20070214; GB 2429101 B 20090603; PT 1752355 E 20100121

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160704

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-11-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-09-30 [REG PL T5] TRANSLATION OF MODIFIED EP PATENT

2014-09-02 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2337388 T5

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-08-27 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2014-08-11 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20140805

2014-07-22 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2014-06-12 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602006010772

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-05-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-05-07 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602006010772

2014-01-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS RAIL AUTOMATION HOLDINGS LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE AND SIGNAL HOLDINGS LIMITED, LONDON, GB

- Document: DE 602006010772

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-01-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006010772

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-01-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006010772

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS RAIL AUTOMATION HOLDINGS LIMITED

2013-12-11 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006010772

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

2013-09-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006010772

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

2012-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2012-09-28 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100603

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-10-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS SAS

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-08-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-07-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-07-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100402

2010-07-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-05-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-05-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-04-23 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2337388 T3

2010-02-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-01-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-01-21 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-01-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006010772 P 20100114

2010-01-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-12-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080326

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B61L 27/00 20060101AFI20061027BHEP

2007-10-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B61L 21/04 20060101ALI20070829BHEP

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU