Global Patent Index - EP 1752591 A3

EP 1752591 A3 2007-10-17 - Interconnection device and method using such a device for connecting a reinforced concrete prefabricated beam to a reinforced concrete prefabricated pillar

Title (en)

Interconnection device and method using such a device for connecting a reinforced concrete prefabricated beam to a reinforced concrete prefabricated pillar

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung und Verfahren mit einer solchen Vorrichtung zum Verbinden einen vorfabrizierten Stahlbetonträger mit einer vorfabrizierten Stahlbetonsäule

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison et procède avec ce dispositif pour relier une poutre préfabriquée en béton armé avec une colonne préfabriquée en béton armé

Publication

EP 1752591 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06118629 A

Priority

IT MI20051565 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1752591A2] An interconnection device (1) for connecting a prefabricated reinforced concrete beam (3) to a prefabricated reinforced concrete pillar (2) is provided with a first intermediate connecting element (10), which is adapted to be inserted, in part, in at least one seat (24) extending into said pillar (2) and having an upper supporting plate (40) for said beam (3); and a second intermediate connecting element (11) essentially defined by a solidified non-shrink grout casting, which extends between the beam (3) and the pillar (2) and, in part, in a first and second recess (19, 32) made respectively in the pillar (2) and in the beam (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/215 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1752591 A2 20070214; EP 1752591 A3 20071017; IT MI20051565 A1 20070212

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-08-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU