Global Patent Index - EP 1752723 A3

EP 1752723 A3 2009-02-18 - Refrigerator with shelf acting as refrigerated drinks container

Title (en)

Refrigerator with shelf acting as refrigerated drinks container

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit Regal, das als gekühlter Getränkebehälter dient

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur avec une étagère laquelle agissant comme contenant de boisson réfrigérée

Publication

EP 1752723 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06116569 A

Priority

IT MI20051563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1752723A2] A refrigerator (1) comprising a housing or cabinet (2) within which at least one cavity (3) is provided to receive at least one shelf (10) for supporting foods or products to be preserved within said cavity (3), this latter being closed by at least one door which on a face thereof, internal or external to said cavity, presents a dispenser member (30) for drink, for example water. The shelf (10) comprises a container (20) for containing the drink to be dispensed by said dispenser (30), said container (20) being connected to this latter.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/02 (2006.01); B29C 65/02 (2006.01); B29C 65/06 (2006.01); B67D 3/04 (2006.01); F25D 23/12 (2006.01); F28F 3/12 (2006.01); F28F 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/126 (2013.01); F25D 25/02 (2013.01); F25D 2323/122 (2013.01); F25D 2331/806 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1752723 A2 20070214; EP 1752723 A3 20090218; BR PI0603189 A 20070327; IT MI20051563 A1 20070211; MX PA06009030 A 20070209

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-12-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 25/02 20060101AFI20061121BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 23/12 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67D 3/04 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/02 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 3/12 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/06 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 21/06 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU