Global Patent Index - EP 1753587 B1

EP 1753587 B1 2007-10-10 - VENEER ASSEMBLING MACHINE

Title (en)

VENEER ASSEMBLING MACHINE

Title (de)

FURNIERZUSAMMENSETZMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A ABOUTER DES MORCEAUX DE PLACAGE

Publication

EP 1753587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05739982 A

Priority

  • EP 2005004114 W
  • DE 102004025431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005115703A1] The invention relates to a veneer assembling machine with at least one slide rail on which veneer pieces to be bonded together are guided. A heating element is assigned to the slide rail. In order to improve prior art veneer assembling machines, the invention provides that the heating element (12) is integrated in the slide rail (5, 6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27D 1/10 (2013.01); Y10T 156/172 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH IT LI PL

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005115703 A1 20051208; CN 1972790 A 20070530; CN 1972790 B 20100609; DE 102004025431 A1 20051222; DE 102004025431 B4 20140410; EP 1753587 A1 20070221; EP 1753587 B1 20071010; US 2008041530 A1 20080221

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150418

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150418

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2014-09-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20140408

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-02-29 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG WINTERTHUR

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH IT LI PL

2007-08-29 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH IT LI PL

2007-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH IT LI PL