Global Patent Index - EP 1757534 A3

EP 1757534 A3 2007-10-10 - Package with tear strip and access window

Title (en)

Package with tear strip and access window

Title (de)

Verpackung mit Aufreissstreifen und Fenster

Title (fr)

Emballage à bande de déchirage et fenêtre d'accès

Publication

EP 1757534 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06017744 A

Priority

US 71188005 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1757534A2] The invention relates to a secondary or outer package (10) for containing a primary package (12). The primary package is for containing a product and the primary package has a dispensing element (26). The secondary package is structured and arranged to house the primary package and has an access means (22) for providing access to the dispensing element, such that product can be dispensed from the primary package without removal of the primary package from the secondary package.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/0413 (2013.01); B65D 77/04 (2013.01); B65D 77/044 (2013.01); B65D 2201/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1757534 A2 20070228; EP 1757534 A3 20071010; CA 2557036 A1 20070226; MX PA06009738 A 20070328; US 2007045154 A1 20070301

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO CORPORATION

2007-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060825

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU