Global Patent Index - EP 1757545 A3

EP 1757545 A3 2007-10-17 - Roll winding device

Title (en)

Roll winding device

Title (de)

Rollenwickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enroulement d'une bande

Publication

EP 1757545 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06115621 A

Priority

DE 102005039302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1757545A2] The winding device has a construction group (15) which includes two guide heads (8) moving as the roll diameter increases, and a linear guide (9) for a vertically movable guide carriage.. The guide heads are mounted on the endface of a controllable and adjustable movement device (12), which is itself connected to the guide carriage moving correspondingly in the linear guide.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/02 (2006.01); B65H 18/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/028 (2013.01); B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2403/20 (2013.01); B65H 2403/41 (2013.01); B65H 2403/52 (2013.01); B65H 2555/10 (2013.01); B65H 2555/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1757545 A2 20070228; EP 1757545 A3 20071017; EP 1757545 B1 20110112; AT 495125 T 20110115; DE 102005039302 A1 20070222; DE 502006008696 D1 20110224

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006008696

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 495125 T

- Effective date: 20130619

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-02-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006008696

- Effective date: 20111013

2011-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111013

2011-02-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006008696

- Effective date: 20110224

2011-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006008696 P 20110224

2011-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT

2008-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080417

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU