Global Patent Index - EP 1757546 A3

EP 1757546 A3 2007-10-17 - Winding machine with bearing rollers

Title (en)

Winding machine with bearing rollers

Title (de)

Tragwalzen-Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Bobineuse à rouleaux porteurs

Publication

EP 1757546 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06115623 A

Priority

DE 102005039303 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1757546A2] The machine (1) winds a web (2) onto at least one winding core (3) to produce at least one wound roll (4) lying in a winding bed (7) formed by two carrier rollers (5, 6). A loading roller (8) presses the roll against the bed. The load roller is connected by mounting rack (10) to a baseplate (11) carrying the winding machine.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/02 (2006.01); B65H 18/20 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 18/025 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2515/50 (2013.01); B65H 2601/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1757546 A2 20070228; EP 1757546 A3 20071017; EP 1757546 B1 20110119; AT 495991 T 20110215; DE 102005039303 A1 20070222; DE 502006008753 D1 20110303

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006008753

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 495991 T

- Effective date: 20130619

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-02-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006008753

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-03-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006008753

- Effective date: 20110303

2011-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006008753 P 20110303

2011-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT

2008-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080417

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU