Global Patent Index - EP 1759397 B1

EP 1759397 B1 2007-10-17 - 40° PHASE-SHIFTING AUTOTRANSFORMER

Title (en)

40° PHASE-SHIFTING AUTOTRANSFORMER

Title (de)

AUTOTRANSFORMATOR MIT 40-GRAD-PHASENVERSCHIEBUNG

Title (fr)

AUTOTRANSFORMATEUR A DEPHASAGE DE 40°

Publication

EP 1759397 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 05717117 A

Priority

  • EP 2005051304 W
  • FR 0404955 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005109457A1] The invention relates to a transformer for converting three-phase power into nine-phase power, in particular for a rectifier. The inventive autotransformer is embodied in the form of a step-up or step-down transformer. For a step-down transformer, three-phase input terminals (E1,E2, E3) are delta-connected to one of main windings, mounted on the respective magnetic legs (M12, M23, M31) of a magnetic circuit. The leg main winding (B12) is provided with intermediate connections (K1,K'1, K''1) from which auxiliary windings (X31, Y23, Z31) mounted on the other legs extend away. Said auxiliary windings produce on output terminals (A1, B1, C1) voltages one of which is in phase with the supply three-phase voltage on the (E1), the other is +40 DEG phase-shifted and the third is + 80 DEG phase-shifted. The number of turns of the auxiliary windings and the position of the intermediate connections are calculated in such a way that said result is obtainable. The identical windings of the other legs produce other output voltages on terminals (A2,B2, C2, A3, B3) in such a way that a nine-phase system is embodied.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 30/02 (2006.01); H01F 30/14 (2006.01); H02M 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 30/02 (2013.01); H01F 30/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005109457 A1 20051117; DE 602005002955 D1 20071129; DE 602005002955 T2 20080724; EP 1759397 A1 20070307; EP 1759397 B1 20071017; ES 2294690 T3 20080401; FR 2870039 A1 20051111; FR 2870039 B1 20060804; US 2008130320 A1 20080605; US 7474188 B2 20090106

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150321

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150321

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005002955

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 4

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090323

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090323

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 4

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294690 T3

2008-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080116

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005002955 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-06-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-06-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 40?? PHASE-SHIFTING AUTOTRANSFORMER

2007-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061020

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT