Global Patent Index - EP 1761652 A4

EP 1761652 A4 2009-02-18 - DIE CAST MAGNESIUM ALLOY

Title (en)

DIE CAST MAGNESIUM ALLOY

Title (de)

DRUCKGEGOSSENE MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE DE MAGNESIUM MOULE

Publication

EP 1761652 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05752425 A

Priority

  • AU 2005000903 W
  • AU 2004903446 A
  • AU 2004906768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006000022A1] A magnesium based alloy contains zinc, aluminium, calcium and/or beryllium, optionally manganese, and the balance magnesium except for incidental impurities. The zinc and aluminium contents fall within a quadrangle defined by lines AB,BC,CD and DA and the calcium and beryllium contents fall within a quadrangle defined by lines EF, FG, GH and HE wherein: A is 10% Zn - 2.5% Al, B is 10% Zn - 5% Al, C is 13% Zn - 6.4% Al, D is 19% Zn - 2.5 % Al, E is 0.01% Ca - 0% Be, F is 1% Ca - 0% Be, G is 0% Ca - 0.0025% Be, and H is 0% Ca - 0.0001% Be.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 23/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0879898 A1 19981125 - AISIN TAKAOKA LTD [JP]
  • [X] WO 03072840 A1 20030904 - JSC AVISMA TITANIUM MAGNESIUM [RU], et al
  • [XY] ZHANG Z ET AL: "An investigation of the properties of Mg-Zn-Al alloys", SCRIPTA MATERIALIA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 39, no. 1, 5 June 1998 (1998-06-05), pages 45 - 53, XP004325272, ISSN: 1359-6462
  • [Y] AVEDESIAN M M ET AL: "Magnesium and Magnesium Alloys; DIE CASTING", ASM SPECIALTY HANDBOOK, 1 May 2000 (2000-05-01), pages 66 - 77, XP002146913
  • [Y] POLMEAR I J: "Magnesium and magnesium alloys, Grades and Alloys", ASM SPECIALTY HANDBOOK. MAGNESIUM AND MAGNESIUM ALLOYS, ASM INTERNATIONAL, MATERIALS PARK, OH, US, 1 May 1999 (1999-05-01), pages 12 - 25, XP002467892
  • See also references of WO 2006000022A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006000022 A1 20060105; CA 2572002 A1 20060105; CN 101006191 A 20070725; CN 101006191 B 20101124; EP 1761652 A1 20070314; EP 1761652 A4 20090218; IL 180193 D0 20070603; JP 2008503651 A 20080207; JP 4729567 B2 20110720; KR 20070049114 A 20070510; MX PA06015208 A 20070315; NO 20070414 A 20070320; RU 2007101661 A 20080727; TW 200600588 A 20060101; US 2007212250 A1 20070913

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110920

2011-09-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090828

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090121

2007-10-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061221

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR