Global Patent Index - EP 1762943 A8

EP 1762943 A8 2007-10-10 - Chip-to-chip communication system

Title (en)

Chip-to-chip communication system

Title (de)

Chip-zu-chip Kommunikationssystem

Title (fr)

Système de communication entre puces

Publication

EP 1762943 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 05019644 A

Priority

EP 05019644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007092011A1] Embodiments of the invention relate to a chip-to-chip communication system including a transmitter and a receiver connected to receive respective transmitter and receiver clock signals. The transmitter includes precharge and evaluation blocks connected to each other and to a transmitter clock terminal. The receiver includes a precharge block connected to a receiver clock terminal. The precharge blocks precharge an output terminal of the transmitter and an input terminal of the receiver, respectively, to a value corresponding to a first voltage reference during a low phase of the transmitter clock signal.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 25/0657 (2013.01); G06F 13/4077 (2013.01); H01L 2225/06527 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01); H01L 2924/3011 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1762943 A1 20070314; EP 1762943 A8 20071010; EP 1762943 B1 20140709; US 2007092011 A1 20070426; US 7808276 B2 20101005

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005044124

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141009

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141009

2015-06-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150410

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140709

2015-04-10 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005044124

2014-08-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005044124

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2014-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2014-03-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140220

2014-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 13/40 20060101ALI20140131BHEP

2014-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 25/065 20060101AFI20140131BHEP

2014-01-31 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602005044124

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0013400000

- IPC: H01L0025065000

2012-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS SRL

2010-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS SRL

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071022

2007-11-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CICCARELLI, LUCA

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAGAGNI, LUCA

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FAZZI, ALBERTO

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CANEGALLO, ROBERTO

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUERRIERI, ROBERTO

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU