Global Patent Index - EP 1763067 A8

EP 1763067 A8 2007-10-24 - METAL HALIDE LAMP, LIGHTING DEVICE FOR METAL HALIDE LAMP AND HEADLIGHT

Title (en)

METAL HALIDE LAMP, LIGHTING DEVICE FOR METAL HALIDE LAMP AND HEADLIGHT

Title (de)

METALLHALOGENLAMPE, LEUCHTE FÜR METALLHALOGENLAMPE UND SCHEINWERFER

Title (fr)

LAMPE HALOGÈNE MÉTALLIQUE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE POUR LAMPE HALOGÈNE MÉTALLIQUE ET PHARE

Publication

EP 1763067 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 05765392 A

Priority

  • JP 2005011845 W
  • JP 2004193066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1763067A1] There are provided a mercury-free metal halide lamp which is improved in light flux rising immediately after starting, more practical and suitable for a headlight, and a metal halide lamp lighting device and a headlight using this. The metal halide lamp according to the present invention comprises: a translucent air-tight container having an inner volume which is not greater than 0.1 cc, including an enclosure portion forming an inner space having a flat surface on a bottom surface, and having a ratio D/L satisfying the following expression: 0.25 ‰ D/L ‰ 0.43 where D is a distance between the bottom surface and a top surface of the inner space at a central portion in a tube-axis direction, and L is a length of the enclosure portion; a pair of electrodes sealed facing each other with an inter-electrode distance which is not greater than 5 mm; and a discharging medium containing a plurality of metal halogen compounds selected from a group of Sc, Na, In, Zn and a rare-earth metal and a rare gas but intrinsically not containing mercury (Hg), wherein a lamp power per unit inner surface area of the air-tight container is not smaller than 60 (W/cm 2 ).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/88 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/125 (2013.01); H01J 61/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1763067 A1 20070314; EP 1763067 A4 20090923; EP 1763067 A8 20071024; CN 1977355 A 20070606; US 2008290801 A1 20081127; WO 2006003894 A1 20060112

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-09-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090825

2007-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METAL HALIDE LAMP, LIGHTING DEVICE FOR METAL HALIDE LAMP AND HEADLIGHT

2007-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU