Global Patent Index - EP 1767255 A3

EP 1767255 A3 2007-10-03 - Game table apparatus

Title (en)

Game table apparatus

Title (de)

Spieltischvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de table de jeux

Publication

EP 1767255 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06019563 A

Priority

JP 2005273923 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1767255A2] A game table apparatus has a game table, a first placement region, a first identification data item reading means, a first calculating means, and a first display means. The first placement region is provided in one area of the game table where a dealer is located and for game value elements held by the dealer to be placed thereon. The first identification data item reading means reads an identification data item from each of the game value elements placed on the first placement region. The first calculating means calculates a total amount of the game value elements placed on the first placement region based on the identification data items. The first display means displays, to the dealer, the total amount of the game value elements calculated by the first calculating means.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/00 (2013.01); A63F 3/00157 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00164 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1767255 A2 20070328; EP 1767255 A3 20071003; AU 2006215314 A1 20070405; CN 101095984 A 20080102; JP 2007082687 A 20070405; US 2007066399 A1 20070322; ZA 200607754 B 20080528

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130403

2011-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSAL ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU