Global Patent Index - EP 1767690 A3

EP 1767690 A3 2007-10-24 - Method for controlling sorting systems and sorting system for using the method

Title (en)

Method for controlling sorting systems and sorting system for using the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung von Sortiersystemen sowie zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens geeignetes Sortiersystem

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la régulation de systèmes de triage et système de triage pour l'application du procédé

Publication

EP 1767690 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07000198 A

Priority

  • EP 02024605 A
  • DE 10160603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1318229A1] To control the multi-stage sorting of fiber suspensions, to be used as pulp for papermaking, each stage sorts the fiber suspension into at least a fine and a coarse fraction. Part of the coarse fraction is taken for further sorting and the derived fine fraction is returned to the sorting process. The mass flows are established at the inflow and outflow of each stage by on-line measurement and/or computation. The registered values are passed to a processor, for mathematic modeling and condition control of the sorting system. The mass flows at the sorting stages and/or selected machine parameters are adjusted according to target values relating to production, efficiency, fiber loss and the like.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03B 5/00 (2006.01); D21D 5/02 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0018 (2013.01); D21D 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318229 A1 20030611; EP 1318229 B1 20070404; AT 358742 T 20070415; CA 2413486 A1 20030610; DE 10160603 A1 20030626; DE 50209858 D1 20070516; EP 1767690 A2 20070328; EP 1767690 A3 20071024; JP 2003239186 A 20030827; US 2003116661 A1 20030626; US 7083049 B2 20060801

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130515

2011-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110211

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2008-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2007-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHABEL, SAMUEL, DR.

2007-03-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1318229 P

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE