Global Patent Index - EP 1767698 A3

EP 1767698 A3 2007-10-24 - Height-adjustable side cover for a screed of a road paver

Title (en)

Height-adjustable side cover for a screed of a road paver

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbares Seitenschild für Einbaubohle eines Strassenfertigers

Title (fr)

Couvercle latéral réglable en hauteur pour une lisseuse d'un finisseur

Publication

EP 1767698 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06019908 A

Priority

DE 102005047096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005047096B3] The device has two lifting mechanisms (72, 74) which are connected to a connecting element (82). A central adjustment device (62-66) is provided which cooperates with the connecting element so two separately lifting mechanisms are adjustable in height at the same time by manipulation of the adjustment device. The central adjustment device is mechanically, electrically and or hydraulically propelled. An independent claim is included for a method.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/42 (2006.01); E01C 19/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2013.01); E01C 19/40 (2013.01); E01C 19/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005047096 B3 20070215; EP 1767698 A2 20070328; EP 1767698 A3 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU